EP1737897 - MIXTURES FOR PRODUCING TRANSPARENT PLASTICS, TRANSPARENT PLASTICS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2009/04] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITT, Bardo An der Helling 26 b 55252 Mainz / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, Patrik Obersdorf 29 64572 Büttelborn / DE | [2007/01] | Application number, filing date | 05706917.1 | 19.01.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005EP00465 | Priority number, date | DE20041019415 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004019415 | [2007/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100422 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737897 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/38 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
C08F228/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG TRANSPARENTER KUNSTSTOFFE, TRANSPARENTE KUNSTSTOFFE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2007/01] | English: | MIXTURES FOR PRODUCING TRANSPARENT PLASTICS, TRANSPARENT PLASTICS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF | [2007/01] | French: | MELANGES POUR LA FABRICATION DE PLASTIQUES TRANSPARENTS, PLASTIQUES TRANSPARENTS, PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIES | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0592935 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-26* the whole document *; | [X]US6342571 (SMITH ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO03011925 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [X] 1-26 * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 20; claim - * * page 13, line 6 - page 15, line 20 *; | [X]WO03011926 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [X] 1-26 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 15; example -; claim - * |