Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006087011 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP01727 | 18.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8893520 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2014 | B2 | US2011314843 | 29.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81633708 | 15.04.2008 | WO2005EP01727 | 18.02.2005 | US97112710 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009120108 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP01727 | 18.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005327835 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP01727 | 18.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1853856 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP01727 | 18.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101124438B | 04.08.2010 | B | CN101124438 | 13.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP01727 | 18.02.2005 |