EP1853856 - CO2-REFRIGERATION DEVICE WITH HEAT RECLAIM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation A Corporation of the State of Delaware 1 Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation A Corporation of the State of Delaware 1 Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINBOKEL, Bernd Am Rheinufer 21 50999 Köln / DE | 02 /
HAAF, Siegfried Holzweg 4 50999 Köln / DE | 03 /
GUPTE, Neelkanth, S. Carrier Corporatione One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | 04 /
JONSSON, Ulf, J. Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | 05 /
SIENEL, Tobias H. c/o Carrier Kältetechnik Deutschland GmbH Am Mainzer Weg 7, 55246 Mainz-Kostheim / DE | [2008/27] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
HEINBOKEL, Bernd Am Rheinufer 21 50999 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
HAAF, Siegfried Holzweg 4 50999 Köln / DE | |||
03 /
GUPTE, Neelkanth, S. Carrier Corporatione One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | |||
04 /
JONSSON, Ulf, J. Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | |||
05 /
SIENEL, Tobias H. Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | |||
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
HEINBOKEL, Bernd Am Rheinufer 21 50999 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
HAAF, Siegfried Holzweg 4 50999 Köln / DE | |||
03 /
GUPTE, Neelkanth, S. Carrier Corporatione One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | |||
04 /
JONSSON, Ulf, J. Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | Representative(s) | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Patentanwälte Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05707519.4 | 18.02.2005 | [2007/46] | WO2005EP01727 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087011 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853856 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/10, F25B29/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
F25B1/10 (EP,US);
F25B29/003 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2339/047 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US);
F25B2400/22 (EP,US);
F25B29/00 (US);
F25D21/10 (EP,US);
F25D21/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CO2-KÄLTEVORRICHTUNG MIT WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2007/46] | English: | CO2-REFRIGERATION DEVICE WITH HEAT RECLAIM | [2007/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFRIGERATION AU CO2 AVEC RECUPERATION DE CHALEUR | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 07.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 16.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 13.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3675441 (PEREZ ARTHUR) [X] 1,6-13,16,18-20 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 61; figure 1 *; | [X]GB143527 (DET DANSKE FRYSNINGS COMPAGNI) [X] 1,6-13,18,19 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2004100979 ; | [X]JP2004184028 ; | [X]CH225518 (ESCHER WYSS MASCHF AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,7,10,11,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2488683 (REFRIGERATION CIE CALADOISE [FR]) [Y] 15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3462966 (REID PHILIP L, et al) [Y] 14,21 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 51; figure 2 *; | [X]US5400615 (PEARSON STEPHEN F [GB]) [X] 1,7,10-12,18,19 * the whole document *; | [X]US6668572 (SEO KOOK-JEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,6-8,10,11,16-18,20,22 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004144528 (KUNIMOTO KEIJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-11,17,18,22 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102004007932 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7-12,18 * paragraph [0035] *; | [X]JP2004156847 ; | [X]EP0908688 (COSTAN SPA [IT]) [X] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2001099503 ; | [X]JP2004218944 ; | [A]JPH10253228 ; | [A]US2537314 (HENRY MORTENSEN) [A] 15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004085104 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004100979 A 20040402 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004184028 A 20040702 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,18 * abstract * | [XY] - SCHIESARO P ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF A TWO STAGE CO2 SUPERMARKET SYSTEM", IIR CONFERENCE. NEW TECHNOLOGIES IN COMMERCIAL REFRIGERATION, (20020722), pages 1 - 10, XP001169091 [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document * [Y] 14,15,21 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004156847 A 20040603 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,8,10,11,17,18,22 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001099503 A 20010413 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-11,18 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004218944 A 20040805 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,7,8,10,11,18 * the whole document * | [X] - REKSTAD H ET AL, "MEASUREMENTS ON A TWO-STAGE CO2-COMPRESSOR", SCIENCE ET TECHNIQUE DU FROID - REFRIGERATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, PARIS, FR, (20040829), ISSN 0151-1637, page COMPLETE, XP000962566 [X] 1,3,18 * the whole document * | [X] - RIEBERER R ET AL, "CO2 HEAT PUMPS FOR SPACE HEATING AND TAP WATER HEATING", INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF REFRIGERATION. PROCEEDINGS - CONGRES INTERNATIONAL DU FROID. COMPTES RENDUS, XX, XX, (19990919), vol. 3, page COMPLETE, XP000962271 [X] 1,16-18 * the whole document * | [X] - GEBHARDT D ET AL, "ENTWICKLUNG EINER TRANSKRITISCHEN ZWEISTUFIGEN SUPERMARKTKAELTEANLAGE FUER TIEF- UND NORMALKUEHLUNG (2) DEVELOPMENT OF A SUPERMARKET TRANSCRITICAL MULTISTAGE REFRIGERATING PLANT FOR CHILLING AND FREEZING", KALTE UND KLIMATECHNIK, GENTNER, STUTTGART, DE, (200310), vol. 56, ISSN 0343-2246, pages 54 - 65, XP008028730 [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10253228 A 19980925 (SANDEN CORP) [A] 5,14,21 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004085104 A 20040318 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 15 * the whole document * | Examination | JP2004003801 | GB2453515 | EP1826510 | - STENE ET AL, "Residential CO2 heat pump system for combined space heating and hot water heating", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRIGERATION, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 28, no. 8, ISSN 0140-7007, (20051201), pages 1259 - 1265, (20051201), XP025278279 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijrefrig.2005.07.006 | - RIEBERER R ET AL, "CO2 HEAT PUMPS FOR SPACE HEATING AND TAP WATER HEATING", INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF REFRIGERATION. PROCEEDINGS - CONGRESINTERNATIONAL DU FROID. COMPTES RENDUS, (19990919), vol. 3, page COMPLETE, XP000962271 | - STENE J, "RESIDENTIAL CO2 HEAT PUMP SYSTEM FOR COMBINED SPACE HEATING AND HOT WATER HEATING", SCIENCE ET TECHNIQUE DU FROID - REFRIGERATION SCIENCE ANDTECHNOLOGY, PARIS, FR, (20040829), ISSN 0151-1637, page COMPLETE, XP000962560 | by applicant | US3675441 | - MEI ET AL., "warm liquid refrigerant for defrosting supermarket refrigerated display cases", ASHRAE TRANSACTIONS, (2002), pages 669 - 672 |