EP1706076 - INTERVERTEBRAL DISCAL PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENT'X Bâtiment Calypso, 18 Parc Ariane 78284 Guyancourt / FR | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLI, Olivier 12, Rue des Cordiers CH-1207 Geneve / CH | 02 /
BEN-MOKHTAR, Mourad 1, Rue Gabrielle F-75018 Paris / FR | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/40] | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05708206.7 | 07.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005FR00034 | Priority number, date | FR20040000087 | 07.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400087 | US20040865487 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 865487 | [2006/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005067823 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706076 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706076 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/4425 (EP);
A61F2/4611 (EP);
A61F2002/30158 (EP);
A61F2002/302 (EP);
A61F2002/30563 (EP);
A61F2002/30662 (EP);
A61F2002/30879 (EP);
A61F2002/30892 (EP);
A61F2002/30904 (EP);
A61F2002/443 (EP);
A61F2230/0026 (EP);
A61F2230/0065 (EP);
A61F2310/00023 (EP);
A61F2310/00203 (EP);
A61F2310/00239 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | BANDSCHEIBENPROTHESE | [2006/40] | English: | INTERVERTEBRAL DISCAL PROSTHESIS | [2006/40] | French: | PROTHESE DISCALE INTERVERTEBRALE | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2005 | AT | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0955021 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,17 * figures 1-6; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] * [Y] 3,6-16,18; | [X]EP1250898 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,17 * figures 10,11 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] *; | [YA]US6517580 (RAMADAN AYMEN [CA], et al) [Y] 3,6,7,9,10,13,14,18 * figures 4,5 * * column 3, line 23 - line 29 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 66 * [A] 1,17; | [YA]US5895428 (BERRY DON [US]) [Y] 10-12 * figures 4,6 * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 27 * * column 8, line 8 - line 17 * [A] 1-3,5,7-9; | [YA]WO03059212 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [Y] 15,16 * figures 1-3 * * page 6, line 1 - line 25 * [A] 1,7,13; | [Y]WO0115638 (CAUTHEN RES GROUP INC [US]) [Y] 8 * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 9 * | by applicant | US5562738 | FR2730159 | FR2659226 |