EP1711090 - FOOD CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HATCO CORPORATION 635 South 28th Street Milwaukee, WI 53215 / US | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAJCHRZAK, Michael 2522 S. 29th Street Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53215 / US | 02 /
WITT, Allan 2585 Eagle Ridge La. Lenoir, North Carolina 28645 / US | 03 /
ROLSTON, David 8411 N. Indian Creek Parkway Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53217 / US | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05711885.3 | 21.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005US02129 | Priority number, date | US20040763726 | 23.01.2004 Original published format: US 763726 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005073094 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1711090 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711090 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/06, A47F3/04 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
A47F3/001 (EP,US);
A47J39/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELBEHÄLTER | [2006/42] | English: | FOOD CONTAINER | [2006/42] | French: | CONTENANT POUR ALIMENTS | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | LT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | IS | 17.07.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
TR | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JP2000175781 ; | [A]US4386558 (HOLMAN J HARRISON [US], et al); | [A]WO0036958 (ALAN NUTTALL LIMITED [GB], et al); | [XAY]US2003172670 (VORMEDAL SVEIN HENRIK [NO]) [X] 1,3-7,10,11,14-20,23,24 * the whole document * [A] 34,42 [Y] 8,9,13,21,22,26 | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000175781 A 20000627 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 27-31,33,48-51,53 * abstract * [A] 34,42 [Y] 8,9,13,21,22,26 |