Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7145008 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2006 | B2 | US2005256125 | 17.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | US12251505 | 05.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007537230 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | WO2005IB01192 | 02.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1751142 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | WO2005IB01192 | 02.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0510980 | 27.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | WO2005IB01192 | 02.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2566332 | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | WO2005IB01192 | 02.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06013164 | 13.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | WO2005IB01192 | 02.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005111022 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR049169 | 05.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200536833 | 16.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US57119704 | 14.05.2004 |