EP1751142 - PYRIMIDINES DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Incorporated Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATH, John Charles, Pfizer Global R & D Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
LUZZIO, Michael Joseph, Pfizer Global R & D Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05731767.9 | 02.05.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005IB01192 | Priority number, date | US20040571197P | 14.05.2004 Original published format: US 571197 P | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005111022 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1751142 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D487/04, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIMIDINDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANORMALEM ZELLWACHSTUM | [2007/07] | English: | PYRIMIDINES DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH | [2007/07] | French: | DERIVES PYRIMIDIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA CROISSANCE DE CELLULES ANORMALES | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO03032997 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [DX] 1-14 * especially examples 1(146), 1(201), 2(20), 7(16), 7(30); page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 24; example -; claim - *; | [A]US6600037 (DAVIS JEREMY MARTIN [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 10, line 30 - line 50; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO03078404 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 24, paragraph 1; example -; claim - *; | [A]US2003181474 (PEASE ELIZABETH JANET [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 6; example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO2004056786 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * page 1 - page 2; example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO2004056807 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * page 1 - page 3; example -; claim - * |