Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7564291 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2009 | B2 | US2007273426 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB51380 | 21.04.2005 | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 | US56808305 | 21.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101185425B | Global Dossier | 02.10.2012 | B1 | KR20060132008 | 20.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB51380 | 21.04.2005 | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008506278 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB51380 | 21.04.2005 | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1743423 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2011 | B1 | EP1743423 | 17.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB51380 | 21.04.2005 | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE512500T | 15.06.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB51380 | 21.04.2005 | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1947337B | 13.04.2011 | B | CN1947337 | 11.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IB51380 | 21.04.2005 | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005104372 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI355802B | 01.01.2012 | B | TW200616330 | 16.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US56549404 | 26.04.2004 |