EP1756104 - TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS HISTAMINE H3 RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2007/40] | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | |||
Former [2007/09] | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Lunn, Graham Pfizer Global Research & Development Ramsgate Road Sandwhich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNN, Graham, Pfizer Global R & D Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 02 /
MATHIAS, John Paul, Pfizer Global R & D Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 03 /
STRANG, Ross Sinclair, Pfizer Global R & D Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Claire, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Laurent, Claire, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Laurent, Claire, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / FR | ||
Former [2008/44] | Laurent, Claire, et al Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2007/09] | Laurent, Claire, et al Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05736116.4 | 06.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005IB01267 | Priority number, date | EP20040291222 | 12.05.2004 Original published format: EP 04291222 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005111036 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756104 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1756104 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/4745, A61K31/4985, A61K31/52, A61P25/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/497 (KR);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | 12.12.2006 | BA | 12.12.2006 | HR | 12.12.2006 | LV | 12.12.2006 | MK | 12.12.2006 | YU | 12.12.2006 | Title | German: | ALS LIGANDEN DES HISTAMIN-H3-REZEPTORS GEEIGNETE TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYRIDINDERIVATE | [2007/09] | English: | TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS HISTAMINE H3 RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2007/09] | French: | DERIVES DE TETRAHYDRONAPHTHYRIDINE UTILISES COMME LIGANDS DU RECEPTEUR H3 DE L'HISTAMINE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | LU | 06.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
LU | 06.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
LU | 06.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0212214 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [AD] 1,12-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1295883 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,12-19 * the whole document *; | [AD] - H. STARK, "Recent advances in histamine H3/H4 receptor ligands", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD, (2003), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 851 - 865, XP002298271 [AD] 1,12-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/eotp.13.6.851.23016 |