Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
16.01.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.08.2008 | Change - withdrawal | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
15.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
08.08.2008 | First examination report | |
02.08.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.05.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.11.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
03.08.2007 | Change - extension states | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
23.05.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.03.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.03.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
09.03.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
01.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.02.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.01.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.01.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.03.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.12.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.12.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.12.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication |