EP1771418 - LARGE CONDUCTANCE CALCIUM-ACTIVATED K CHANNEL OPENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI, Miki, c/o Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | 02 /
KUSAMA, Mari, c/o Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | 03 /
HOSAKA, Toshihiro, c/o Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | 04 /
KOHNOMI, Shuntarou 73-2, Shimizu-machi 4-chome, Matsuyama-shi Ehime 790-0823 / JP | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Simons, Amanda Louise J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Simons, Amanda Louise J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05745982.8 | 30.05.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005JP10287 | Priority number, date | JP20040160660 | 31.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004160660 | JP20040191849 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004191849 | US20040584142P | 01.07.2004 Original published format: US 584142 P | JP20040348136 | 01.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004348136 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005115984 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771418 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61, C07D401/14, C07D239/42, C07D239/26, C07D401/10, C07D401/04, C07D409/04, C07D213/64, C07D239/34, C07D213/57, C07D213/55, A61P13/00, A61K31/444 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
C07D213/55 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D213/57 (EP,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07D239/30 (EP,US);
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN, DIE CALCIUMABHÄNGIGE KALIUMKANÄLE MIT GROSSER LEITFÄHIGKEIT ÖFFNEN | [2007/15] | English: | LARGE CONDUCTANCE CALCIUM-ACTIVATED K CHANNEL OPENER | [2007/15] | French: | AGENT D'OUVERTURE DE CANAUX K ACTIVES PAR LE CALCIUM A CONDUCTANCE ELEVEE | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 22.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/38] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/40] | 17.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002156087 (NUSS JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,15,18-21 * paragraph [0739]; examples 76,78,180,197,198; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0222584 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-21 * pages 17,18 *; | [Y]EP1400243 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * claim 1; compounds 14,82-99 *; | [Y] - WERMUTH ET AL, "Molecular Variations Based on Isosteric Replacements", PRACTICE OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), pages 203 - 237, XP002190259 [Y] 1-21 * page 216 * |