EP1759396 - INSULATION FOR AN IMPROVED HIGH-SPEED DATA TRANSMISSION CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EARNEST, Thomas, Robert, Jr. 2311 West 16th Street Wilmington, Delaware 19806 / US | 02 /
FAVEREAU, Daniel, A. 7 Chemin du Mont-Rond CH-1292 Chambesy / CH | 03 /
MCKEE, Niall, D. 34 Rossiter Circle Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | 04 /
TOOLEY, Patricia, A. 1742 Forest Hills Drive Vienna, West Virginia 26105 / US | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
ERNEST, Thomas, Robert, Jr. 2311 West 16th Street Wilmington, Delaware 19806 / US | ||
02 /
FAVEREAU, Daniel, A. 7 Chemin du Mont-Rond CH-1292 Chambesy / CH | |||
03 /
MCKEE, Niall, D. 34 Rossiter Circle Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | |||
04 /
TOOLEY, Patricia, A. 1742 Forest Hills Drive Vienna, West Virginia 26105 / US | |||
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
ERNEST, Thomas, Robert, Jr. 3908 Heather Drive Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | ||
02 /
FAVEREAU, Daniel, A. 7 Chemin du Mont-Rond CH-1292 Chambesy / CH | |||
03 /
MCKEE, Niall, D. 34 Rossiter Circle Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | |||
04 /
TOOLEY, Patricia, A. 1742 Forest Hills Drive Vienna, West Virginia 26105 / US | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05759636.3 | 15.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005US21244 | Priority number, date | US20040872623 | 21.06.2004 Original published format: US 872623 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006009761 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759396 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/44, C08F214/26, C08F8/22 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
H01B3/445 (EP,US);
C08F214/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/39] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERUNG FÜR EIN VERBESSERTES HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSDATENÜBERTRAGUNGSKABEL | [2007/10] | English: | INSULATION FOR AN IMPROVED HIGH-SPEED DATA TRANSMISSION CABLE | [2007/10] | French: | ISOLATION POUR CABLE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES GRANDE VITESSE AMELIORE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1260526 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0011] , [0015] , [0021] , [0022] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0036]; claim - *; | [X]EP0423995 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 43 * * page 4, lines 15-18; claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO03059969 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 1, lines 24,25 * * page 11, lines 7-10; claims 12-14 *; | [DA]US5703185 (BLAIR LESLIE MITCHELL [US]) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 32 *; | [PX]WO2004104057 (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1-6 * abstract * * claim - *; | [PX]WO2004104056 (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1-6 * abstract * * page 10, lines 15-20; claims 2,8,9 * | Examination | - "STANDARD TEST METHOD FOR MELT FLOW RATES OF THERMOPLASTICS BY EXTRUSION PLASTOMETER", ASTM DESIGNATION: D 1238-99, XX, XX, (20000401), pages 261 - 270, XP000973546 | - "ASTM D2520 - 95 Standard Test Methods for Complex Permittivity (Dielectric Constant) of Solid Electrical Insulating Materials at Microwave Frequencies and Temperatures to 1650oC", ASTM DESIGNATION, ASTM INTERNATIONAL, US, (19861201), vol. D2520, pages 7 - 22, XP009140008 | - "ASTM D2520-01 Standard Test Method for Complex Permittivity (Dielectric Constant) of Solid Electrical Insulating Materials at Microwave Frequencies and Temperatures to 1650 °C", ASTM D2520-01 Standard Test Method for Complex Permittivity (Dielectric Constant) of Solid Electrical Insulating Materials at Microwave Frequencies and Temperatures to 1650 °C, ASTM International, (20010701), vol. D2520, pages 1 - 16, XP055199551 |