Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2007016976

WO2007016976 - OPTICAL REFLECTOMETRY ANALYSIS BASED ON FIRST ORDER AND SECOND ORDER SCATTER SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Database last updated on 22.07.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc.
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto CA 94306-2024 / US
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / NEBENDAHL, Bernd
Ziehrerweg 1
71254 Ditzingen / DE
02 / BELLER, Josef
Liststrasse 11/1
72074 Tübingen / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date05769901.904.08.2005
WO2005EP53857
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007016976
Date:15.02.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007
[2007/07]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP15.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01M11/00, G01K11/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR 
TitleGerman:
English:OPTICAL REFLECTOMETRY ANALYSIS BASED ON FIRST ORDER AND SECOND ORDER SCATTER SIGNALS
French:ANALYSE PAR REFLECTOMETRIE OPTIQUE A PARTIR DE SIGNAUX DE DIFFUSION DU PREMIER ORDRE ET DU SECOND ORDRE
Examination procedure05.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/36]
18.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2008/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
04.03.200803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5113277
 [A]EP0213872
 [A]US5449233
 [A]US4673299