EP1786655 - AIRBAG AND A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AB 447 83 Vargarda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSER, Stefan Viehbacher Weg 6 85778 Haimhausen / DE | 02 /
ZAURITZ, Ralf Alpenblickstrasse 15 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 03 /
WEYAND, Jürgen Erlhausen 8 85258 Weichs / DE | 04 /
MIKSITS, Christian Wolfskoben 84 58640 Iserlohn / DE | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Schön, Thilo, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Thilo Schön Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Schön, Thilo, et al Patentanwälte Mayer Frank Schön Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05774987.1 | 27.08.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005EP09260 | Priority number, date | DE20041042209 | 01.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004042209 | DE20041048898 | 06.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004048898 | [2007/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006024472 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1786655 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1786655 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B60R21/239 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2395 (EP,US);
B60R21/23138 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASSACK UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2007/21] | English: | AIRBAG AND A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/21] | French: | SAC GONFLABLE ET VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | IE | 14.04.2010 | IT | 14.04.2010 | LT | 14.04.2010 | LV | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | PL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 12.05.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | IS | 14.08.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | AT | 27.08.2010 | LU | 27.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 27.08.2010 | ||
LU | 27.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 27.08.2010 | ||
LU | 27.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 27.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 27.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
AT | 27.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002079905 ; | [X]US3887213 (GOETZ GEORGE W) [X] 1,4-10,12-15 * column 3, line 10 - line 46; figures 1,3-6 *; | [X]EP0700808 (TAKATA INC [US]) [X] 1,9,16 * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 34; figures 8,9 *; | [X]US2003020268 (REITER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002079905 A 20020319 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract * |