EP1779602 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC FREQUENCY REUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Li Philips Electronics China 21/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu,Xi Road Shanghai 200070 / CN | 02 /
SHANG, Dan Philips Electronics China 21/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu,Xi Road Shanghai 200070 / CN | 03 /
PAN, Sheng Philips Electronics China 21/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu,Xi Road Shanghai 200070 / CN | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Ledeboer, Johannes Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Ledeboer, Johannes Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Postbus 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05780615.0 | 03.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005IB52593 | Priority number, date | CN2004156538 | 10.08.2004 Original published format: CN200410056538 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016330 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779602 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04Q7/38 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,KR);
H04L67/104 (KR);
H04W4/08 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/53 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN FREQUENZWIEDERVERWENDUNG | [2007/18] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC FREQUENCY REUSE | [2007/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR REUTILISATION DE FREQUENCE DYNAMIQUE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 27.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002085520 (SYDON UWE [DE], et al) [Y] 8,11,13,20,21 * paragraphs [0007] , [0026] *; | [Y]US2002155846 (SHIRAGA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 7,12 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] *; | [A]WO03021886 (TOSHIBA RES EUROP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-21* page 7, line 4 - page 11, line 2 *; | [XY] - CERVELLO G ET AL, "Dynamic Channel SDelection (DCS) Scheme for 802.11", IEEE 802.11-00/195, XX, XX, (20000712), pages 1 - 7, XP002213585 [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,14,16-19 * paragraphs [0003] , [03.2] , [03.3] , [03.4] , [03.5] , [03.6] * [Y] 7,8,11-13,20,21 |