EP1809180 - SELF-CLOSING EXTERNAL VESSEL CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INOVA MEDICAL AG Alte Steinhauserstrasse 1 6330 Cham / CH | [2008/13] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Inova Medical Ag Alte Steinhauserstrasse 1 6330 Cham / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARREN, Ernst-Diethelm Grabenackerstrasse 32 CH-6312 Steinhausen / CH | 02 /
LEHMANN, Marc, Ulrich Gartenstrasse 8 CH-8704 Herrliberg / CH | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 473 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2007/30] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05791410.3 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005CH00609 | Priority number, date | CH20040001731 | 20.10.2004 Original published format: CH 17312004 | [2007/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006042431 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809180 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809180 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/08 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/085 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00659 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00862 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHLIESSENDER EXTERNER GEFÄSSVERSCHLUSS | [2007/30] | English: | SELF-CLOSING EXTERNAL VESSEL CLOSURE | [2007/30] | French: | SYSTEME EXTERNE D'OBTURATION DE VAISSEAU SANGUIN A OBTURATION AUTOMATIQUE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 08.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IE | 16.04.2008 | LT | 16.04.2008 | LV | 16.04.2008 | PT | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | IS | 16.08.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | LU | 18.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/01] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
LU | 18.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
LU | 18.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
LU | 18.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LT | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
LV | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 16.04.2008 | |
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19726386 (HARREN ERNST DIETHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 6,11,14 *; | [A]WO03082127 (DATASCOPE INVESTMENT CORP [US]) | by applicant | EP0955901 |