14.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] |
03.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
03.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
27.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
05.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
22.05.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
20.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
20.02.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
26.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] |
14.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
14.03.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
22.02.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
12.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.12.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
25.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.06.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
22.06.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
09.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|