Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007293888 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008516743 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1809180 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2008 | B1 | EP1809180 | 25.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101043849B | 12.05.2010 | B | CN101043849 | 26.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202005021494U | 15.05.2008 | U1 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005003779D1 | 29.05.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA011192 | 27.02.2009 | B1 | EA200700903 | 26.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1809180T | 30.09.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | WO2005CH00609 | 18.10.2005 | EP05791410 | 18.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006042431 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE392185T | 15.05.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2306215T | 01.11.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH17312004 | 20.10.2004 |