Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1815647

EP1815647 - METHOD FOR PRIORITY BASED QUEUING AND ASSEMBLING OF PACKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.2010
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2009/33]
Former [2007/32]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BUCKNELL, Paul
Philips IP & Standards, Cross Oak Lane
Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
02 / BAKER, Matthew P. J.
Philips IP & Standards, Cross Oak Lane
Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
03 / MOULSLEY, Timothy J.
Philips IP & Standards, Cross Oak Lane
Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
 [2007/32]
Representative(s)Schouten, Marcus Maria
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2007/32]Schouten, Marcus Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date05799607.604.11.2005
[2007/32]
WO2005IB53618
Priority number, dateGB2004002491811.11.2004         Original published format: GB 0424918
[2007/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006051465
Date:18.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1815647
Date:08.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006
[2007/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1815647
Date:12.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2007/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/32]
Extension statesAL11.06.2007
BA11.06.2007
HR11.06.2007
MK11.06.2007
YU11.06.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR WARTESCHLANGEN UND ZUM ZUSAMMENSETZEN VON PAKETEN AUF PRIORITÄTSBASIS[2009/13]
English:METHOD FOR PRIORITY BASED QUEUING AND ASSEMBLING OF PACKETS[2007/32]
French:PROCEDE DE MISE EN FILE D'ATTENTE ET D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PAQUETS DE DONNEES EN FONCTION PRIORITE[2007/32]
Former [2007/32]VERFAHREN FÜR WARTESCHLANGEN AUF PRIORITÄTSBASIS UND ZUM ASSEMBLIEREN VON PAKETEN
Entry into regional phase11.06.2007National basic fee paid 
11.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/32]
26.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2009Fee for grant paid
29.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.08.2009
BE12.08.2009
CY12.08.2009
CZ12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
RO12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
SK12.08.2009
IE04.11.2009
LU04.11.2009
BG12.11.2009
GR13.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
HU13.02.2010
[2011/45]
Former [2011/32]AT12.08.2009
BE12.08.2009
CZ12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
RO12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
SK12.08.2009
IE04.11.2009
LU04.11.2009
BG12.11.2009
GR13.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
HU13.02.2010
Former [2011/22]AT12.08.2009
BE12.08.2009
CZ12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
RO12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
SK12.08.2009
IE04.11.2009
LU04.11.2009
BG12.11.2009
GR13.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/46]AT12.08.2009
BE12.08.2009
CZ12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
RO12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
SK12.08.2009
IE04.11.2009
BG12.11.2009
GR13.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/30]AT12.08.2009
BE12.08.2009
CZ12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
RO12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
SK12.08.2009
BG12.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/28]AT12.08.2009
BE12.08.2009
CZ12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
RO12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
SK12.08.2009
BG12.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/24]AT12.08.2009
CZ12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
RO12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
SK12.08.2009
BG12.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/20]AT12.08.2009
DK12.08.2009
EE12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
BG12.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/17]AT12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
BG12.11.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/16]AT12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
IS12.12.2009
PT12.12.2009
Former [2010/13]AT12.08.2009
FI12.08.2009
LT12.08.2009
LV12.08.2009
NL12.08.2009
SE12.08.2009
SI12.08.2009
IS12.12.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004042420  (AGARWAL ANIL K [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 2-4,6 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 22 * * page 3, paragraphs 30,32-34 * * page 5, paragraph 66 * * page 6, paragraph 70 * * page 7, paragraph 85 * * page 10, paragraph 144 * * page 11, paragraphs 150,151 *;
 [A]US6795870  (BASS BRIAN MITCHELL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, lines 32-61 * * column 4, lines 11-29,40-62 * * column 5, lines 51-67 * * column 6, lines 1-15 * * column 11, lines 15-60 * * column 14, lines 57-67 * * column 15, lines 1-6 *;
 [A]US6601041  (BROWN YALE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,6,9,10 * * column 1, lines 45-67 * * column 2, lines 1-54 * * column 6, lines 15-44 * * column 9, lines 31-60 * * column 14, lines 30-48 * * column 17, lines 47-54 *