EP1829407 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROUTING COMMUNICATIONS IN CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VASCODE TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 6 Yifat Street 694217 Tel Aviv / IL | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states VASCODE TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 32 Dvorah Haneviah 69350 Tel- Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTTES, Dorron 32 Dvorah Haneviah 69350 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Schramm, Michael, et al Bettinger Schneider Schramm Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Schramm, Michael, et al Bettinger Schneider Schramm, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05808272.8 | 23.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005IL01246 | Priority number, date | IL20040165362 | 24.11.2004 Original published format: IL 16536204 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006056983 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1829407 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/12 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ROUTEN VON ÜBERMITTLUNGEN IN ZELLULAREN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | [2007/36] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROUTING COMMUNICATIONS IN CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2007/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ACHEMINEMENT DE COMMUNICATIONS DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5329578 (BRENNAN PAUL M [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,11,12,26-29,36,38,39,43-45,47,53,55 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 65 * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 46 *; | [XY]WO0042809 (AT MOBILE COM CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9,11,12,26-29,36,38,39,43-45,47,53,55 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 17 * * page 6, line 27 - page 11, line 9 * * claims 1-25 * [Y] 5,42; | [A]EP1301056 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,9,11,12,26-29,36,38,39,42-45,47,53,55 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0006] ** paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0019] , [0020] *; | [Y]WO2004028124 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 5,42 * page 7, lines 1-33 * * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 18 * * page 12, lines 7-22 * * page 16, lines 20-22 * |