Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8515083 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2013 | B2 | US2006165237 | 27.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11586 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7668722 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2010 | B2 | US2006140412 | 29.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005EP11587 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4527782B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2010 | B2 | JP2008517338 | 22.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005EP11587 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4527781B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2010 | B2 | JP2008517337 | 22.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11586 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1738353 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2007 | B1 | EP1738353 | 03.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005EP11587 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1730726 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2007 | B1 | EP1730726 | 13.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11586 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1969317B | 29.12.2010 | B | CN1969317 | 23.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005EP11587 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1998046B | 18.01.2012 | B | CN1998046 | 11.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11586 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005002256T | 29.05.2008 | T2 | DE602005002256D1 | 11.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005EP11587 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005002833T | 13.03.2008 | T2 | DE602005002833D1 | 22.11.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11586 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1097082 | 15.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005EP11587 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1097336 | 27.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11586 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1730726T | 31.03.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05811028 | 28.10.2005 | WO2005EP11586 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1738353T | 31.01.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05797620 | 28.10.2005 | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | WO2005EP11587 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006048204 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006048203 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100905067B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2009 | B1 | KR20070049627 | 11.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100885192B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2009 | B1 | KR20070038043 | 09.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE371925T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE375590T | 15.10.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2292147T | 01.03.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2294738T | 01.04.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2369918 | 10.10.2009 | C2 | RU2006146947 | 10.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2369917 | 10.10.2009 | C2 | RU2006146948 | 10.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE0402652D0 | 02.11.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI338281B | 01.03.2011 | B | TW200627380 | 01.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI328405B | 01.08.2010 | B | TW200629961 | 16.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0402652 | 02.11.2004 |