EP1730726 - MULTI-CHANNEL AUDIO ENERGY LOSS COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/50] | METHODS FOR IMPROVED PERFORMANCE OF PREDICTION BASED MULTI-CHANNEL RECONSTRUCTION | ||
[2007/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coding Technologies AB Döbelnsgatan 64 113 52 Stockholm / SE | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states Coding Technologies AB Döbelnsgatan 64 113 52 Stockholm / SE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLEMOES, Lars c/o Coding Technologies AB Gävlegatan 12 S-113 30 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
KJÖRLING, Kristofer c/o Coding Technologies AB Gävlegatan 12 S-113 30 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
PURNHAGEN, Heiko c/o Coding Technologies AB Gävlegatan 12 S-113 30 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
RÖDEN, Jonas c/o Coding Technologies AB Gävlegatan 12 S-113 30 Stockholm / SE | 05 /
BREEBAART, Jeroen Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
HOTHO, Gerard Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
VILLEMOES, Lars Döbelnsgatan 64 S-113 52 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
KJÖRLING, Kristofer Döbelnsgatan 64 S-113 52 Stockholm / SE | |||
03 /
PURNHAGEN, Heiko Döbelnsgatan 64 S-113 52 Stockholm / SE | |||
04 /
RÖDEN, Jonas Döbelnsgatan 64 S-113 52 Stockholm / SE | |||
05 /
BREEBAART, Jeroen Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
06 /
HOTHO, Gerard Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05811028.9 | 28.10.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005EP11586 | Priority number, date | SE20040002652 | 02.11.2004 Original published format: SE 0402652 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006048203 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1730726 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1730726 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04S2420/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPENSATION VON MULTIKANAL-AUDIO ENERGIEVERLUSTEN | [2007/17] | English: | MULTI-CHANNEL AUDIO ENERGY LOSS COMPENSATION | [2007/17] | French: | COMPENSATION DE PERTES D'ENERGIE POUR SIGNAUX AUDIO MULTICANAUX | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/50] | VERFAHREN FÜR EINE VERBESSERTE LEISTUNG VON VORHERSAGE-BASIERTER MULTIKANAL-REKONSTRUKTION | ||
Former [2006/50] | METHODS FOR IMPROVED PERFORMANCE OF PREDICTION BASED MULTI-CHANNEL RECONSTRUCTION | ||
Former [2006/50] | PROCEDES ASSURANT UNE MEILLEURE QUALITE DE LA PREDICTION BASES SUR LA RECONSTRUCTION MULTIVOIE | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 12.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2007 | BE | 10.10.2007 | CH | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | CZ | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | EE | 10.10.2007 | LI | 10.10.2007 | LT | 10.10.2007 | LV | 10.10.2007 | RO | 10.10.2007 | SI | 10.10.2007 | SK | 10.10.2007 | LU | 28.10.2007 | IE | 30.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | BG | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | IS | 10.02.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | HU | 11.04.2008 | [2016/07] |
Former [2010/01] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
TR | 10.10.2007 | ||
LU | 28.10.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
HU | 11.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
LV | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2005086139 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,42,44,45,47,50,52 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 5 *; | [XA] - FALLER CHRISTOF, "Parametric coding of spatial audio - Thesis No 3062", THESE PRESENTEE A LA FACULTE INFORMATIQUE ET COMMUNICATIONS INSTITUT DE SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION SECTION DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION ÉCOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FÉDÉRALE DE LAUSANNE POUR L'OBTENTION DU GRADE DE DOCTEUR ES SCIENCES, (20040924), XP002343263 [X] 1,42,44,45,47,50,52 * abstract * * page 71 - page 84 * [A] 2-41,43,46,48,49,51 | [PX] - BREEBAART J ET AL, "MPEG spatial audio coding / MPEG surround: Overview and current status", AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY CONVENTION PAPER, 119TH AES CONVENTION, New York, USA, (20051007), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://infoscience.epfl.ch/getfile.py?docid=4982&name=SPACE_AES199_v9&format=pdf&version=1, (20060120), XP002364486 [PX] 1,30,42-45,52 * abstract * * paragraph [3.3.2] * * paragraph [04.3] * |