EP1828615 - ARRANGEMENT OF A SHAFT WITH A SLIP-RING SEAL MOUNTED THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burgmann Industries GmbH & Co. KG Äussere Sauerlacher Strasse 6-10 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEIGL, Peter Lärchenweg 5 82515 Höhenrain / DE | 02 /
LEDERER, Andreas Glogauerstrasse 39 80992 München / DE | 03 /
SIMON, Clemens Giselastrasse 6 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner European Patent Attorneys Postfach 440120 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05814583.0 | 01.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP12794 | Priority number, date | DE20042019718U | 21.12.2004 Original published format: DE 202004019718 U | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006066692 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828615 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828615 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/12, F16J15/34 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F04C27/009 (EP,US);
F16J15/3404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/52] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG AUS EINER WELLE MIT DARAUF MONTIERTER GLEITRINGDICHTUNG | [2007/36] | English: | ARRANGEMENT OF A SHAFT WITH A SLIP-RING SEAL MOUNTED THEREON | [2007/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONSTITUE D'UN ARBRE SUR LEQUEL UN JOINT A ANNEAUX GLISSANTS EST MONTE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3560004 (DONLEY PHILIP F, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP1113176 (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4634134 (ENTRIKIN RAYMOND A [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB1340341 (WESTON CO LTD CHARLES) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3146844 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4294454 (CANNINGS JOHN A) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4558870 (MARTINEZ ANGEL C [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |