EP1831199 - MMP inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/37] | NOVEL COMPOUNDS | ||
[2011/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GABOS, Balint AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 02 /
LUNDKVIST, Michael AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 03 /
MUNCK AF ROSENSCHÖLD, Magnus AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 04 /
SHAMOVSKY, Igor AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | 05 /
ZLATOIDSKY, Pavol AstraZeneca R & D Lund S-221 87 Lund / SE | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Wahlström, Christer, et al AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Wahlström, Stig Christer Gunnar, et al AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 05815745.4 | 14.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005SE01917 | Priority number, date | SE20040003085 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: SE 0403085 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006065215 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831199 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831199 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/444, A61K31/506, A61P11/06, A61P19/02, A61P35/00, A61P9/10, C07D471/04 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4709 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | 17.07.2007 | BA | 17.07.2007 | HR | 17.07.2007 | MK | 17.07.2007 | YU | 17.07.2007 | Title | German: | MMP-Inhibitoren | [2011/31] | English: | MMP inhibitors | [2011/31] | French: | Inhibiteurs de la MMP | [2011/31] |
Former [2007/37] | NEUE VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2007/37] | NOVEL COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2007/37] | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2005 | ES | 15.12.2007 | AT | 15.02.2012 | BE | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | ES | 15.12.2007 | |
AT | 15.02.2012 | ||
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 15.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02074767 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO02074750 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2004024718 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2004024715 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2004033632 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al); | [A]WO2004108086 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) |