EP1827360 - COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS HAVING CARNITINE CREATINATE AND METHODS FOR USING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avon Products, Inc. 777 Third Avenue New York, NY 10017 / US | [2013/11] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states AVON PRODUCTS, INC. 1251 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10020-1196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALAFSKY, Robert, E. 24 Willow Grove Court Ogdensburg, NJ 07439 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05826087.8 | 08.11.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US40480 | Priority number, date | US20040018901 | 21.12.2004 Original published format: US 18901 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006068715 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1827360 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/06, A61K8/44 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
A61K8/4946 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/008 (EP,US);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | A61K6/00, A61K8/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT CARNITINCREATINAT UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/36] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS HAVING CARNITINE CREATINATE AND METHODS FOR USING | [2007/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES AYANT UNE CREATINATE DE CARNITINE ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 14.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5994581 (FANG SEN-MAW [US]) [DY] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004074216 (VAMA FARMACOSMETICA S R L [IT], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 5, line 4 - line 11 ** page 9, line 14 - line 16 * | International search | [Y]US6432424 (SHAPIRO STANLEY S [US], et al); | [Y]US6653504 (BUONONATO ANTONIETTA [IT]); | [A]US2004029969 (BLATT THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2002044913 (HAMILTON NATHAN D [US]) | Examination | FR2619007 |