Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009155267 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13268808 | 20.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009032534 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US19335308 | 18.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009017911 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93725607 | 26.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008052104 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2008 | A3 | WO2008052104 | 02.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | US92264207 | 10.04.2007 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008045799 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2008 | A3 | WO2008045799 | 17.04.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008039165 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2008 | A3 | WO2008039165 | 03.04.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US39049306 | 27.03.2006 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007136523 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2008 | A3 | WO2007136523 | 29.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007114931 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2008 | A3 | WO2007114931 | 11.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48846506 | 18.07.2006 | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US78902206 | 04.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006024023 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2009 | A3 | WO2006024023 | 02.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US62960404 | 19.11.2004 | US60429304 | 24.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005119772 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2006 | A3 | WO2005119772 | 15.12.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57619504 | 02.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005111593 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A3 | WO2005111593 | 24.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US54676204 | 23.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005094221 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2008 | A3 | WO2005094221 | 13.10.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005069868 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A3 | WO2005069868 | 04.08.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57619504 | 02.06.2004 | US56475904 | 23.04.2004 | US56163204 | 12.04.2004 | US54645204 | 19.02.2004 | US53677504 | 15.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005062031 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005026694 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2006 | A3 | WO2005026694 | 24.03.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004044586 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A8 | WO2004044586 | 27.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004040671 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2004 | A3 | WO2004040671 | 13.05.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03078652 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2004 | A3 | WO03078652 | 25.09.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | US38870103 | 14.03.2003 | US36656602 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016187276 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US47143 | 23.12.2005 | US201514961572 | 07.12.2015 | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US27474706 | 14.11.2006 | US201313867925 | 22.04.2013 | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US86837307 | 05.10.2007 | US70329307 | 07.02.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016123947 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514724675 | 28.05.2015 | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US11112105 | 20.04.2005 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US47124303 | 16.05.2003 | US38870103 | 14.03.2003 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | US39049306 | 27.03.2006 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US36656602 | 22.03.2002 | US13918405 | 27.05.2005 | US66515305 | 25.03.2005 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | US9055005 | 25.03.2005 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US201213442720 | 09.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9291613 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2016 | B2 | US2015008486 | 08.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92264207 | 10.04.2007 | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US62246804 | 25.10.2004 | US25941405 | 25.10.2005 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US201414306156 | 16.06.2014 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | US9055005 | 25.03.2005 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | US201113084465 | 11.04.2011 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US38870103 | 14.03.2003 | US54179406 | 02.10.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9588077 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2017 | B2 | US2014353154 | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92264207 | 10.04.2007 | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | US14632008 | 25.06.2008 | US47124303 | 16.05.2003 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | US54676204 | 23.02.2004 | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US94580304 | 20.09.2004 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US201113092869 | 22.04.2011 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US201414306160 | 16.06.2014 | US57619504 | 02.06.2004 | US6350405 | 23.02.2005 | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US70786305 | 12.08.2005 | US93725607 | 26.06.2007 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9234867 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2016 | B2 | US2013306491 | 21.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US47124303 | 16.05.2003 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US201313867925 | 22.04.2013 | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US86837307 | 05.10.2007 | US70329307 | 07.02.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013287644 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | US201313847353 | 19.03.2013 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US19335308 | 18.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9103775 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2015 | B2 | US2013075794 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66912605 | 06.04.2005 | US70406603 | 07.11.2003 | US63995404 | 28.12.2004 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US73869405 | 21.11.2005 | US31835405 | 23.12.2005 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | US9055005 | 25.03.2005 | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US201213442856 | 10.04.2012 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US40003806 | 06.04.2006 | US66044105 | 10.03.2005 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US65727505 | 28.02.2005 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013075690 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US201213442720 | 09.04.2012 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9210806 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2015 | B2 | US2012119159 | 17.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89707707 | 29.08.2007 | US57619504 | 02.06.2004 | WO2005US19311 | 31.05.2005 | US57975007 | 10.08.2007 | US85194606 | 16.10.2006 | US85696706 | 06.11.2006 | US201213356976 | 24.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012045691 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113284769 | 28.10.2011 | US201161537703 | 22.09.2011 | US89707707 | 29.08.2007 | US57619504 | 02.06.2004 | WO2005US19311 | 31.05.2005 | US57975007 | 10.08.2007 | US85194606 | 16.10.2006 | US85696706 | 06.11.2006 | US48509909 | 16.06.2009 | US13268808 | 20.06.2008 | US201161537752 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8456074 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2013 | B2 | US2012025165 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US47124303 | 16.05.2003 | US201113096891 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8778269 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2014 | B2 | US2012018301 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14632008 | 25.06.2008 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US93725607 | 26.06.2007 | US201113092869 | 22.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8754454 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2014 | B2 | US2012006102 | 12.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113084465 | 11.04.2011 | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US92264207 | 10.04.2007 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011154648 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113047593 | 14.03.2011 | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | US63452509 | 09.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8900517 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | B2 | US2011003698 | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93818007 | 09.11.2007 | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010323925 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US72353005 | 03.10.2005 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US36656602 | 22.03.2002 | US13918405 | 27.05.2005 | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | US9055005 | 25.03.2005 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | US38870103 | 14.03.2003 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | US94580304 | 20.09.2004 | US54179406 | 02.10.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010231242 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | US63452509 | 09.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010137731 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US48579309 | 16.06.2009 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010085067 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US11112105 | 20.04.2005 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US39049306 | 27.03.2006 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US66515305 | 25.03.2005 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US56031609 | 15.09.2009 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7714398 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2010 | B2 | US2010056892 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US39049306 | 27.03.2006 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US66515305 | 25.03.2005 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US47124303 | 16.05.2003 | US77363104 | 06.02.2004 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US44565403 | 06.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010047901 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US66912605 | 06.04.2005 | US70406603 | 07.11.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US66044105 | 10.03.2005 | US25941405 | 25.10.2005 | US62246804 | 25.10.2004 | US60791209 | 28.10.2009 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009317710 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48509909 | 16.06.2009 | US13268808 | 20.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009297836 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54676204 | 23.02.2004 | US6350405 | 23.02.2005 | US88885907 | 02.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009165533 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40836202 | 04.09.2002 | US65552903 | 04.09.2003 | US24563808 | 03.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009101996 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26832708 | 10.11.2008 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | US94580304 | 20.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7955559 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2009084678 | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14632008 | 25.06.2008 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US93725607 | 26.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009056419 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US19335308 | 18.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7948041 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2011 | B2 | US2008221806 | 11.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US92264207 | 10.04.2007 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8425745 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2013 | B2 | US2008185295 | 07.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US86837307 | 05.10.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7513437 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2009 | B2 | US2008135629 | 12.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2927005 | 05.01.2005 | US694008 | 07.01.2008 | US53677504 | 15.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8152991 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2012 | B2 | US2008093226 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US63636006 | 08.12.2006 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8127440 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2012 | B2 | US2008086876 | 17.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89707707 | 29.08.2007 | US85194606 | 16.10.2006 | US85696706 | 06.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008044651 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57619504 | 02.06.2004 | WO2005US19311 | 31.05.2005 | US57975005 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008023327 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54676204 | 23.02.2004 | US6350405 | 23.02.2005 | US88880907 | 02.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008021339 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007259359 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21202605 | 24.08.2005 | US63995404 | 28.12.2004 | US73869405 | 21.11.2005 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US31835405 | 23.12.2005 | US60429304 | 24.08.2004 | US70095305 | 19.07.2005 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US69540107 | 02.04.2007 | US62960404 | 19.11.2004 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US78902206 | 04.04.2006 | US65727505 | 28.02.2005 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007208243 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US70406603 | 07.11.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US47124303 | 16.05.2003 | US77363104 | 06.02.2004 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | US94580304 | 20.09.2004 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US44565403 | 06.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007178477 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US21202605 | 24.08.2005 | US70406603 | 07.11.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US62960404 | 19.11.2004 | US60429304 | 24.08.2004 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007140946 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70329307 | 07.02.2007 | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8154093 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2012 | B2 | US2007132043 | 14.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66912605 | 06.04.2005 | US70406603 | 07.11.2003 | US63995404 | 28.12.2004 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US73869405 | 21.11.2005 | US31835405 | 23.12.2005 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | US9055005 | 25.03.2005 | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US40003806 | 06.04.2006 | US66044105 | 10.03.2005 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US65727505 | 28.02.2005 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007114573 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40836202 | 04.09.2002 | US65552903 | 04.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007048181 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US11112105 | 20.04.2005 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US39049306 | 27.03.2006 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US66515305 | 25.03.2005 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007048180 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US68346005 | 19.05.2005 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US39049306 | 27.03.2006 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US66515305 | 25.03.2005 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007045756 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40836202 | 04.09.2002 | US48846506 | 18.07.2006 | US65552903 | 04.09.2003 | US70095305 | 19.07.2005 | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007037057 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70786305 | 12.08.2005 | US50281106 | 10.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006263255 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65288305 | 15.02.2005 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | US40836202 | 04.09.2002 | US94580304 | 20.09.2004 | US11112105 | 20.04.2005 | US65552903 | 04.09.2003 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US35456106 | 14.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006228723 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US66912605 | 06.04.2005 | US70406603 | 07.11.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US66044105 | 10.03.2005 | US25941405 | 25.10.2005 | US62246804 | 25.10.2004 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7575933 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2009 | B2 | US2006078468 | 13.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | US38870103 | 14.03.2003 | US36656602 | 22.03.2002 | US13918405 | 27.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7522040 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2009 | B2 | US2006055392 | 16.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65288305 | 15.02.2005 | US11112105 | 20.04.2005 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005279987 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7547931 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2009 | B2 | US2005245836 | 03.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US1979204 | 20.12.2004 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7285198 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2007 | B2 | US2005186333 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54676204 | 23.02.2004 | US6350405 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7956525 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2005184641 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84607204 | 14.05.2004 | US47124303 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005169798 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | US9055005 | 25.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7449757 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2008 | B2 | US2005157445 | 21.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | US94580304 | 20.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005156318 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2927005 | 05.01.2005 | US53677504 | 15.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005129573 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004253741 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77363104 | 06.02.2004 | US44565403 | 06.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004132070 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US70406603 | 07.11.2003 | US40854702 | 05.09.2002 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6905655 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2005 | B2 | US2003175161 | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | US38870103 | 14.03.2003 | US36656602 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003134433 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34967002 | 16.01.2002 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5743974B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2015 | B2 | JP2012247432 | 13.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US62960404 | 19.11.2004 | US60429304 | 24.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5611041B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | B2 | JP2010537823 | 09.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | WO2008US73746 | 20.08.2008 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US19335308 | 18.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009537219 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US10836 | 04.05.2007 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009532064 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US48846506 | 18.07.2006 | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | WO2007US08422 | 03.04.2007 | US78902206 | 04.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008525822 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US47143 | 23.12.2005 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US21202605 | 24.08.2005 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US63995404 | 28.12.2004 | US73869405 | 21.11.2005 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US65727505 | 28.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008511008 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US62960404 | 19.11.2004 | US60429304 | 24.08.2004 | WO2005US30487 | 24.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007515227 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US42998 | 20.12.2004 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007505323 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US30136 | 13.09.2004 | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006518543 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0319808 | 20.06.2003 | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006505806 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US0335635 | 07.11.2003 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2198146 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96755207 | 04.09.2007 | WO2008US73746 | 20.08.2008 | US92432807 | 25.10.2007 | US19335308 | 18.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2029013 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2011 | A4 | EP2029013 | 04.03.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US10836 | 04.05.2007 | US48845606 | 18.07.2006 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2007379 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2009 | A4 | EP2007379 | 31.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48846506 | 18.07.2006 | US90153807 | 14.02.2007 | US85021706 | 06.10.2006 | US58884506 | 26.10.2006 | WO2007US08422 | 03.04.2007 | US78902206 | 04.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1941270 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | A4 | EP1941270 | 09.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | WO2006US28079 | 18.07.2006 | US70094405 | 20.07.2005 | US39049306 | 27.03.2006 | US77313806 | 13.02.2006 | US43727506 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1781771 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US62960404 | 19.11.2004 | US60429304 | 24.08.2004 | WO2005US30487 | 24.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1695072 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2011 | A4 | EP1695072 | 30.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US42998 | 20.12.2004 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1680353 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2012 | A4 | EP1680353 | 19.07.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | WO2004US30562 | 17.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1664724 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2007 | A4 | EP1664724 | 07.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US30136 | 13.09.2004 | US50248503 | 12.09.2003 | US50466303 | 18.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1560958 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2006 | A4 | EP1560958 | 10.08.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0319808 | 20.06.2003 | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1558933 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US0335635 | 07.11.2003 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003301728 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2004 | A8 | AU2003301728 | 25.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0319808 | 20.06.2003 | US17792902 | 21.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003291385 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65689803 | 05.09.2003 | US42489202 | 08.11.2002 | US0335635 | 07.11.2003 | US34578303 | 16.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003225839 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2003 | A8 | AU2003225839 | 29.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | US0308181 | 14.03.2003 | US38870103 | 14.03.2003 | US36656602 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1831670 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2010 | A4 | EP1831670 | 12.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US47143 | 23.12.2005 | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US21202605 | 24.08.2005 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US63995404 | 28.12.2004 | US73869405 | 21.11.2005 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US65727505 | 28.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0417802 | 10.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US42998 | 20.12.2004 | US56424804 | 20.04.2004 | US53107903 | 18.12.2003 | US94032404 | 13.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2426826 | 25.06.2008 | B | GB2426826 | 06.12.2006 | A | GB0617521D0 | 18.10.2006 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US54676204 | 23.02.2004 | WO2005US06131 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2445892 | 23.07.2008 | A | GB0807472D0 | 04.06.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US54676204 | 23.02.2004 | GB0617521 | 23.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6894359 | 17.05.2005 | B2 | US2004043527 | 04.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28026502 | 26.10.2002 | US40841202 | 04.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7312095 | 25.12.2007 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9966402 | 15.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006071895 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2007 | A3 | WO2006071895 | 06.07.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73090505 | 27.10.2005 | US21202605 | 24.08.2005 | US27474705 | 15.11.2005 | US63995404 | 28.12.2004 | US73869405 | 21.11.2005 | US66887905 | 05.04.2005 | US74883405 | 09.12.2005 | US65727505 | 28.02.2005 |