EP1831670 - NANOELECTRONIC DEVICES FOR DNA DETECTION, AND RECOGNITION OF POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanomix, Inc. 5980 Horton Street, 6th Floor Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Nanomix, Inc. 5980 Horton Street, 6th Floor Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | ||
For all designated states Niemann, Joseph 4578 Serra Avenue Fremont CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GABRIEL, Jean-christophe, P. 1205 Macdonald Drive Pinole, California 94564 / US | 02 /
GANDHI, Shripal 6 Commodore Drive, c-235 Emeryville, California 94608 / US | 03 /
GRUNER, George 960 Kenfield Ave. Los Angeles, California 90049 / US | 04 /
JOINER, Charles, Steven, Jr. 861 Cottonwood Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
SOSNOWSKI, Ron 1013 Adella Avenue Coronado, California 92118 / US | 06 /
STAR, Alexander 5465 Pocusset Street Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15217 / US | 07 /
TU, Eugene 3527 Lark Street San Diego, California 92103 / US | 08 /
VALCKE, Christian 32 Dos Posos Orinda, California 94563 / US | 09 /
NIEMANN, Joseph 4578 Serra Avenue Fremont, California 94538 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855662.2 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005US47143 | Priority number, date | US20040639954P | 28.12.2004 Original published format: US 639954 P | US20050657275P | 28.02.2005 Original published format: US 657275 P | US20050668879P | 05.04.2005 Original published format: US 668879 P | US20050212026 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: US 212026 | US20050730905P | 27.10.2005 Original published format: US 730905 P | US20050274747 | 15.11.2005 Original published format: US 274747 | US20050738694P | 21.11.2005 Original published format: US 738694 P | US20050748834P | 09.12.2005 Original published format: US 748834 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006071895 | Date: | 06.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1831670 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/00, G01N33/543, C12Q1/68, C12M3/00, G01N33/00, G01N27/00, G01N27/12 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/5438 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6825 (EP);
G01N27/4145 (EP);
G01N27/4146 (EP);
B01L3/5027 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2565/631 (EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2007/37] | G01N21/00, G01N33/543, C12Q1/68, C12M3/00, G01N33/00, G01N27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR DNA-DETEKTION UND ERKENNUNG VON POLYNUCLEOTIDSEQUENZEN | [2007/37] | English: | NANOELECTRONIC DEVICES FOR DNA DETECTION, AND RECOGNITION OF POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES | [2007/37] | French: | DISPOSITIFS NANOELECTRONIQUES POUR LA DETECTION D'ADN ET LA RECONNAISSANCE DE SEQUENCES POLYNUCLEOTIDIQUES | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 17.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO0144796 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [X]US2002117659 (LIEBER CHARLES M [US], et al); | [A]US2002179434 (DAI HONGJIE [US], et al); | [A]US2004202603 (FISCHER ALAN [US], et al); | [A] - CUI ET AL., "Nanowire Nanosensors for Hihgly Sensitive and Selective Detection of Biological and Chemical Species", SCIENCE, (20010817), vol. 293, pages 1289 - 1291, XP002951584 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1062711 |