Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1705752
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.05.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
11.06.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
18.05.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.05.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.02.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.02.2008 |
First examination report |
|
20.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.11.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
19.07.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.04.2007 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.04.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
05.01.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.01.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |
25.08.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |