Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006217005 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005013989 | 26.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006278336 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005013989 | 26.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1705752 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2010 | B1 | EP1705752 | 27.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005013989 | 26.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005013989 | 05.02.2009 | B4 | DE102005013989 | 05.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005013989 | 26.03.2005 |