EP1705752 - Electrical connector socket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphenol-Tuchel Electronics GmbH August-Häusser-Strasse 10 74080 Heilbronn / DE | [2010/28] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states AMPHENOL-TUCHEL ELECTRONICS GmbH August-Häusser-Strasse 10 D-74080 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langhoff, Wolfgang Werrengasse 2 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Johannes, et al Becker & Müller Patentanwälte Turmstr. 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Schweiger, Johannes, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001372.9 | 24.01.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | DE20051013989 | 26.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005013989 | [2006/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705752 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705752 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/187, // H01R43/16 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
H01R13/187 (EP,US);
H01R43/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckverbinderbuchse | [2006/39] | English: | Electrical connector socket | [2006/39] | French: | Douille de connecteur électrique | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 28.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004003498 (SWEARINGEN DEAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11 * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0144]; figures 26-29 * [Y] 5,8,9; | [XAY]EP1473803 (ALCOA FUJIKURA LTD [US]) [X] 1-7,10 * paragraph [0008]; figures 1B,2E-2H * [A] 11 [Y] 5; | [Y]US6261134 (MUZSLAY STEVEN ZOLTAN [US]) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 54 - line 60; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US5131853 (MEYER KEVIN E [US]) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 16 - line 24; figure 8 *; | [XA]WO9843321 (INGOS ELEKTRONIK HANDELSGESELL [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 5 * * page 6, line 4 - line 19; figures 1,2 * [A] 11; | [X]US2001014560 (DAUGHERTY JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US2002187686 | US4657335 | US2004003498 | EP1473803 |