EP1736828 - Photoresist monomer, polymer thereof and photoresist composition including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONGJIN SEMICHEM CO., LTD 472-2 Gajwa-Dong Seo-Ku Incheon 404-253 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states DONGJIN SEMICHEM CO., LTD 472-2 Gajwa-Dong Seo-Ku Incheon 404-253 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jung-Youl 625-3, Yodang-Ri Yanggam-Myeon Hwaseong-si Kyungki-do 445-931 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jae-Woo 625-3, Yodang-Ri Yanggam-Myeon Hwaseong-si Kyungki-do 445-931 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jae-Hyun 625-3, Yodang-Ri Yanggam-Myeon Hwaseong-si Kyungki-do 445-931 / KR | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012870.9 | 22.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | KR20050055190 | 24.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050055190 | KR20050074435 | 12.08.2005 Original published format: KR 20050074435 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736828 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736828 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039, C07C69/54, C08F220/20 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
G03F7/0397 (EP,US);
C07C69/54 (EP,US);
C08F220/1811 (EP,US);
G03F7/0395 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2602/42 (EP,US);
C07C2602/44 (EP,US);
C07C2603/74 (EP,US);
Y10S430/106 (EP,US);
Y10S430/111 (EP,US);
Y10S430/115 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT [2007/36] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photoresistmonomer, dessen Polymer und diesen enthaltende Fotolackzusammensetzung | [2006/52] | English: | Photoresist monomer, polymer thereof and photoresist composition including the same | [2006/52] | French: | Monomère photorésistant, polymère correspondant et composition photorésistante l'incluant | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2006104171 ; | [A]EP0930541 (JSR CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,7,11,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraph [0168] *; | [A]EP1112995 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,7,11,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018] *; | [A]US6632586 (AOAI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 21 - column 21; examples a20,a23 *; | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 32, Database accession no. 2006-301169, XP002398129 & JP2006104171 A 20060420 (HONSHU CHEM IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0930541 | EP1112995 |