Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007075196 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005046869 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070037374 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005046869 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007100955 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005046869 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1770285 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005046869 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1940314 | 04.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005046869 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005046869 | 12.06.2008 | B4 | DE102005046869 | 19.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005046869 | 30.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200728611 | 01.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005046869 | 30.09.2005 |