EP1767435 - Electric power steering control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK LTD. 6-1, Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Tomohiro NSK Ltd. 78, Toribacho Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-8527 / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Masahiro NSK Ltd. 78, Toribacho Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-8527 / JP | 03 /
Itakura, Yusuke NSK Ltd. 78, Toribacho Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-8527 / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020024.3 | 25.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | JP20050280644 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005280644 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1767435 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
B62D5/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für eine elektrische Servolenklung | [2007/13] | English: | Electric power steering control device | [2007/13] | French: | Dispositif électrique d'assistance de direction | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |