Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
02.12.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.10.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
08.10.2008 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.02.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
06.04.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |