Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007098485 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20050104670 | 03.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100758217B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2007 | B1 | KR20070047864 | 08.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20050104670 | 03.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007125369 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20050104670 | 03.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1782710 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2008 | A3 | EP1782710 | 09.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20050104670 | 03.11.2005 |