Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1816009 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2011 | B1 | EP1816009 | 08.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06101378 | 07.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE507088T | 15.05.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP06101378 | 07.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502006009386D1 | 09.06.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP06101378 | 07.02.2006 |