EP1816009 - Closing mechanism for loose, perforated sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ring Alliance Ringbuchtechnik GmbH Ziedlergasse 15 1231 Wien - Atzgersdorf / AT | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellend, Andreas Baumergasse 8 1210 Wien / AT | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Henhapel, Bernhard Kliment & Henhapel Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Henhapel, Bernhard Kliment & Henhapel Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06101378.5 | 07.02.2006 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816009 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816009 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B42F13/24 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
B42F13/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Verschlussmechanik für gelochte, lose Blätter | [2007/32] | English: | Closing mechanism for loose, perforated sheets | [2007/32] | French: | Mécanisme de fermeture pour feuilles mobiles perforées | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2006 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE378692 (KILLISCH & CO) [X] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [X]DE1259292 (SOENNECKEN FA F) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 6 *; | [Y]EP0911180 (KOLOMAN HANDLER GMBH [AT]) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1129865 (LECO STATIONERY MFG [HK]); | [X]WO02058942 (BARTH THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1 * page 20 - page 21; figures 11,12 * | by applicant | EP0207059 | EP1129865 |