EP1717704 - Protection of program execution performed by an integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS S.A. 29 Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states ST MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 29 Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teglia, Yannick Bâtiment B 22, Traverse de la Dominique 13011, MARSEILLE / FR | 02 /
Liardet, Pierre-Yvan 56, Rue du Pralon Lotissement L'Audiguier 13790, PEYNIER / FR | 03 /
POMET, Alain Les Bannettes 13790, ROUSSET / FR | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Thibon, Laurent, et al Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Thibon, Laurent, et al Cabinet Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | ||
Former [2006/44] | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 06112820.3 | 20.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | FR20050051006 | 20.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0551006 | [2006/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717704 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717704 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/28 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G06F11/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2012/13] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schutz des Ablaufs eines von einem integrierten Schaltkreis ausgeführten Programms | [2006/44] | English: | Protection of program execution performed by an integrated circuit | [2006/44] | French: | Protection du déroulement d'un programme exécuté par un circuit intégré | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.06.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2790844 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 15, line 19 - page 18, line 11 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2003188231 (CRONCE PAUL A [US]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0047] *; | [A]FR2849226 (OBERTHUR CARD SYST SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * Annexe A.; page 11, line 15 - page 14, line 19 * | by applicant | FR2849226 |