EP1780898 - Integrated smart card and battery for mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallagher, Nial S. 1101 West River Road, RR4 Cambridge Ontario N1R 5S5 / CA | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Patel, Binesh, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Patel, Binesh, et al Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2007/18] | Rickard, David John 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06113624.8 | 08.05.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | EP20050023766 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05023766 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1780898 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, G06K19/077, G06K7/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
H04B1/3816 (EP,US);
G06K19/0702 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06K19/07739 (EP,US);
G06K7/006 (EP,US);
H04B1/3883 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | 17.05.2006 | BA | 17.05.2006 | HR | 17.05.2006 | MK | 17.05.2006 | YU | 17.05.2006 | Title | German: | Integrierte Batterie und Chiptkarte für mobile Vorrichtungen | [2007/18] | English: | Integrated smart card and battery for mobile devices | [2007/18] | French: | Batterie et carte à puce intégrées pour dispositifs mobiles | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 03.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2008 | 15.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/15] | 30.11.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003272582 ; | [X]JP2001266823 ; | [X]US2003217210 (CARAU FRANK P [US]) [X] 1-5,11-17 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE202004009815U (CELECTRONIC VOLKER CZMOK ELEKT [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005197169 (SON CHANG-BAI [KR]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003272582 A 20030926 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-5,9-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0030]; figures 1,9,10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001266823 A 20010928 (UNION MACHINERY CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |