Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1890299
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.07.2014 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
27.06.2014 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
30.05.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
14.01.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
26.09.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
23.09.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
21.03.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
18.01.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
04.08.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|