Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008044560 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06119067 | 17.08.2006 | US82518907 | 05.07.2007 | US83937706 | 22.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008046118 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06119067 | 17.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1890299 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06119067 | 17.08.2006 |