EP1890299 - Method of manufacturing a radiation image storage panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2014 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare NV Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare NV Antwerpsestraat 195 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tahon, Jean-Pierre AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Theunis, Patrick, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. HE / Intellectual Property 3802 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Theunis, Patrick, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. HE / Intellectual Property 3802 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 06119067.4 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890299 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G21K4/00, C09K11/85 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US);
C09K11/7733 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/44] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Strahlungsbildspeicherschirms | [2008/08] | English: | Method of manufacturing a radiation image storage panel | [2008/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un panneau de stockage d'image à rayonnement | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 21.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/31] | 25.06.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2014 | 01.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2001007352 (HELL ERICH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-18 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0021] , [0031] , [0043] - [0045] - [0048] * * claims 1-16 *; | [XD]US2004081750 (LEBLANS PAUL [BE], et al) [XD] 1-18 * paragraph [0024] * * claims 1-8 *; | [XD]US2004146639 (ISODA YUJI [JP]) [XD] 1-18 * paragraphs [0010] , [0033] , [0034] , [0045] , [0051] , [0058] , [0110] - [0116] * * claims 1-12 *; | [X]EP1460643 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] - [0067] , [0097] ** claims 1-27 *; | [X]EP1496134 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0057] , [0061] , [0069] , [0070] , [0083] - [0090] * * claims 1-24 * |