|
23.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |