Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
14.09.2015 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
02.09.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.04.2015 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
09.12.2014 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
26.09.2014 | First examination report | |
23.09.2014 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.08.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.10.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
23.08.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.08.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
14.08.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.08.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.08.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.08.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.10.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
27.08.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.08.2008 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
01.02.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
01.02.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
07.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant |