EP1895383 - Mobile wireless communications device having dual antenna system for cellular and WiFi [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAN, Ying Tong 358 Red Osier Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2V8 / CA | 02 /
QI, Yihong 2383 Carmel-Koch Road St. Agatha, Ontario, N0B 2L0 / CA | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Fennell, Gareth Charles Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06119892.5 | 31.08.2006 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895383 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H01Q21/28, H01Q1/24, H01Q9/04, H01Q1/42 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H01Q1/42 (EP);
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q21/28 (EP);
H01Q9/0421 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | AL | 12.08.2008 | BA | 12.08.2008 | HR | 12.08.2008 | MK | 12.08.2008 | RS | 12.08.2008 | Title | German: | Tragbares Mobilfunkgerät mit Dualantennensystem für Mobiltelefon und WiFi | [2008/10] | English: | Mobile wireless communications device having dual antenna system for cellular and WiFi | [2008/10] | French: | Dispositif de communication mobil sans fil avec système à deux antennes cellulaire et WiFi | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 01.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/43] | 14.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2015 | 15.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0205381 (ALLGON AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0009]; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1291968 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-25* paragraph [0073]; figures 23-26 *; | [A]EP1503450 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010]; figures 3,8 *; | [A]US2005057407 (IMAIZUMI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0007] , [0009]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2005067635 (HAVA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0013] , [0033]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2006181468 (IGUCHI AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0023] , [0024] , [0027] , [0035] , [0041]; figure 1; claim 1 * | Examination | EP0851533 | US2006038736 | US2006176219 |