EP1733855 - Flat board stamping apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI MACHINERY LIMITED 27, Takasago 3-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Yoshio Asahi Machinery Limited 27 Takasago 3-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252868.2 | 02.06.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | JP20050173570 | 14.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005173570 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733855 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/00, B26D7/18, B65H29/62, // B26D7/00, B26F1/40, B26D7/32 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
B26D5/007 (EP);
B26D5/34 (EP);
B26D7/18 (EP);
B65H29/62 (EP);
B26D7/00 (EP);
B26D7/32 (EP);
B26F1/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Stanzen von flächigen Platten | [2006/51] | English: | Flat board stamping apparatus | [2006/51] | French: | Dispositif d'estampage de plaques planes | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1018412 (ASAHI TEKKOSHO KK [JP]) [YD] 1-4 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE29704889U (EUROPA CARTON FALTSCHACHTEL [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * pages 4-5; figure 1; claim 11 *; | [A]JP2001334587 ; | [A]US5705020 (CHIARI MAURO [CH]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001334587 A 20011204 (RENGO CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |