20.11.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.02.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
03.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
29.09.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.08.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
19.06.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.06.2009 |
First examination report |
|
10.04.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
07.06.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.03.2007 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.03.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
15.12.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
13.12.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.07.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |