EP1689158 - Method for configuring a fixed terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEMCOM BROADBAND SAS 250, route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2010/52] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS SAS 250, route de l'Empereur 92848 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS 250, Route de l'Empereur 92848 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS SAS Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Sagem Communications 27, rue Leblanc 75512 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Sagem Communication Le Ponant de Paris 27, Rue Leblanc 75512 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanaan, Nadi 36, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Leloup, Philippe 4, rue Paul Doumer 94130 Nogent sur Marne / FR | 03 /
Rotter, Harald Kreuzgasse 91/1111 1170 Wien / AT | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Camus, Olivier Jean-Claude SCHMIT-CHRETIEN-SCHIHIN 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300091.3 | 31.01.2006 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | FR20050050319 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0550319 | [2006/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689158 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/04, H04M11/00, H04M3/42 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
H04M3/42178 (EP);
H04M3/5322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2007/16] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Konfigurierung eines festen Endgeräts | [2006/32] | English: | Method for configuring a fixed terminal | [2006/32] | French: | Procédé de configuration d'un terminal fixe | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 10.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002078185 (SWERUP JAN [SE], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0019] - [0031] - [0041] - [0050] , [0057] , [0079] *; | [X]US5561709 (REMILLARD ROGER [US]) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 23 * * column 5, line 47 - column 8, line 9 *; | [A]US2004127204 (BELMONT BRIAN V [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0026] - [0031] , [0032] * |