Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
31.08.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.03.2010 | First examination report | |
16.03.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
25.02.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.02.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.05.2008 | Change - extension states | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
05.03.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.11.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
26.10.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.10.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
26.10.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
23.10.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.10.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant | |
19.09.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.09.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.04.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication |