Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7890922 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2011 | B2 | US2009119639 | 07.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34947209 | 06.01.2009 | US7052905 | 01.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5065056B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2012 | B2 | JP2008532154 | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP60293 | 27.02.2006 | US7052905 | 01.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1859399 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP60293 | 27.02.2006 | US7052905 | 01.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006092388 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7052905 | 01.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7496887 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2009 | B2 | US2006200797 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7052905 | 01.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101116095 | 30.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US7052905 | 01.03.2005 |